to get results quickly and correctly in the multiplication operation in this regard with the number twenty-five are as follows.

Numbers are multiplied by twenty-five, the first step: the number by 4 and the results we multiply by 100 and if there is remaining, the rest of us to multiply by 25 and the end result is the result of multiplying the total the second.

Example:

1. 8 x 25 =

how:

numbers 8 divided by 4 the result is 2, and the number 2 we multiply the 100 then the result is 200. So the result of 8 x 25 = 200.

2. 15 x 25 =

how:

numbers 15 we divide by 4 to get the three remaining 3. Numbers 3, we multiply 100 and number 3, we multiply 25, the result of multiplication that we sum up the number. Then 3 x 100 + 3 x 25 = 300 x 75 = 75. So the result of 15 x 25 = 350.

3. 78 x 25 =

how:

numbers 78 divided by 4 to get the 19 remaining 2. Numbers 19 x 100 and 2 x 25, then gained 1900 + 50 = 1950.

Numbers are multiplied by twenty-five, the first step: the number by 4 and the results we multiply by 100 and if there is remaining, the rest of us to multiply by 25 and the end result is the result of multiplying the total the second.

Example:

1. 8 x 25 =

how:

numbers 8 divided by 4 the result is 2, and the number 2 we multiply the 100 then the result is 200. So the result of 8 x 25 = 200.

2. 15 x 25 =

how:

numbers 15 we divide by 4 to get the three remaining 3. Numbers 3, we multiply 100 and number 3, we multiply 25, the result of multiplication that we sum up the number. Then 3 x 100 + 3 x 25 = 300 x 75 = 75. So the result of 15 x 25 = 350.

3. 78 x 25 =

how:

numbers 78 divided by 4 to get the 19 remaining 2. Numbers 19 x 100 and 2 x 25, then gained 1900 + 50 = 1950.

## 0 comments:

## Post a Comment