To get quick results in the operator of a particular number multiplication operation with the number eleven is as follows. Numbers are multiplied we sum up the number and outcome of the sum of the numbers we put down between the multiplied by the number eleven.

Example:

1. 12 x 11 =How: add the numbers 1 and 2, where the result is 3. Numbers 3 put between 1 and 2, then it can be the result 132. So the results of the 12 x 11 = 132.

2. 29 x 11 =How:Add up the numbers 2 and 9, where the result is 11. Numbers one behind is placed between 2 and 9, number 1 in front added to the number 2 is to 3. So the results of the 29 x 11 = 319.

3. 48 x 11 =How:Add up the numbers 4 and 8, where the result is 12. Numbers 2 of twelve placed between 4 and 8 and the number 1 added to the number 4 in which the number to 5. Thus, the results dar 48 x 11 = 528.

good easy

Example:

1. 12 x 11 =How: add the numbers 1 and 2, where the result is 3. Numbers 3 put between 1 and 2, then it can be the result 132. So the results of the 12 x 11 = 132.

2. 29 x 11 =How:Add up the numbers 2 and 9, where the result is 11. Numbers one behind is placed between 2 and 9, number 1 in front added to the number 2 is to 3. So the results of the 29 x 11 = 319.

3. 48 x 11 =How:Add up the numbers 4 and 8, where the result is 12. Numbers 2 of twelve placed between 4 and 8 and the number 1 added to the number 4 in which the number to 5. Thus, the results dar 48 x 11 = 528.

good easy

## 0 comments:

## Post a Comment